Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 10/31/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 12/03/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 12/04/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/24/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/28/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/31/2008