Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/11/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 01/30/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/07/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/07/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/07/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/07/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/07/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/07/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/08/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/12/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/12/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/14/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/21/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/21/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/16/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/16/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/16/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/18/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 04/19/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/30/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/30/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/30/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/30/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/07/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/07/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/07/2007
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 05/08/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/08/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/21/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/21/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/21/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/21/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/21/2007
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 05/22/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/23/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/23/2007