Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 11/13/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 11/13/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 11/13/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 11/13/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 11/13/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 11/13/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 11/13/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 11/13/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 11/13/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 11/13/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 11/13/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 11/13/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 11/13/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 11/13/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 11/13/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 11/13/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 11/13/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 11/13/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 11/14/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/14/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 11/15/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 11/15/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 12/03/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 12/03/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 12/03/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 12/03/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 12/05/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 12/11/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 12/11/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 12/11/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/12/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/31/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/02/2008
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/16/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/05/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/31/2008