Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 11/13/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 11/14/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 11/14/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 11/14/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 11/14/2007
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 11/14/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 11/14/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 11/14/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/15/2007
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 11/15/2007
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 11/16/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 12/03/2007