Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 11/15/2007
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 12/05/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 01/22/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 01/22/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 02/08/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 02/25/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 03/31/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 04/30/2008
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 05/01/2008
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 05/01/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 06/12/2008
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 07/15/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/29/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/19/2008