Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 12/03/2007
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 12/03/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 12/03/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 12/03/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 12/03/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 12/03/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 12/03/2007
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA]* 12/03/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 12/05/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 12/06/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 12/10/2007
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 12/11/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 12/11/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 12/12/2007
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 12/13/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 12/13/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 12/14/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 12/14/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 01/28/2008