Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 01/10/2007
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 01/22/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/26/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/27/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/01/2007
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 05/07/2007
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/11/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/12/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/15/2008