Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 12/13/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 01/22/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/10/2008
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 04/01/2008
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/09/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/24/2008