There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Federal Rules of Evidence to address the waiver of the attorney-client privilege and the work product doctrine.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
09/19/2008Became Public Law No: 110-322. (TXT | PDF)
09/19/2008Signed by President.
09/11/2008Presented to President.
09/08/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7817)
02/27/2008Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1317-1319; text as passed Senate: CR S1318-1319)
02/25/2008Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. With written report No. 110-264.
12/11/2007Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
09/19/2008Became Public Law No: 110-322. (TXT | PDF)
09/19/2008Signed by President.
09/11/2008SenatePresented to President.
09/08/2008-2:54pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/08/2008-2:54pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7817)
09/08/2008-2:38pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2450.
09/08/2008-2:38pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7817-7820)
09/08/2008-2:37pmHouseMs. Jackson-Lee moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/28/2008HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
02/28/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/28/2008-10:04amHouseReceived in the House.
02/27/2008SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1317-1319; text as passed Senate: CR S1318-1319)
02/25/2008SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 580.
02/25/2008SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. With written report No. 110-264.
01/31/2008SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
12/11/2007SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S15142)
12/11/2007SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S15141-15142)

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 12/11/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 12/17/2007

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary12/11/2007 Referred to
01/31/2008 Markup by
02/25/2008 Reported by S. Rept. 110-264
House Judiciary02/28/2008 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.2450. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-322 (09/19/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Federal Rules of Evidence with respect to the disclosure of a communication or information covered by the attorney-client privilege and work product protection.

Provides that, when such a disclosure is made in a federal proceeding or to a federal office or agency, and waives the attorney-client privilege or work-product protection, the waiver extends to an undisclosed communication or information in a federal or state proceeding only if: (1) the waiver is intentional; (2) the disclosed and undisclosed communications or information concern the same subject matter; and (3) they ought in fairness to be considered together.

States that, when the disclosure is made in a federal proceeding or to a federal office or agency, it does not operate as a waiver in a federal or state proceeding if: (1) the disclosure is inadvertent; (2) the holder of the privilege or protection took reasonable steps to prevent disclosure; and (3) the holder promptly took reasonable steps to rectify the error.

Declares that, when the disclosure is made in a state proceeding and is not the subject of a state-court order concerning waiver, it does not operate as a waiver in a federal proceeding if the disclosure: (1) would not be a waiver under this rule if it had been made in a federal proceeding; or (2) is not waived under law of the state where the disclosure occurred.