There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Community Building Code Administration Grant Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to promote and enhance the operation of local building code enforcement administration across the country by establishing a competitive Federal matching grant program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
12/12/2007Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
12/12/2007Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/05/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/21/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/28/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 10/02/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs12/12/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2458. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (12/12/2007)

Community Building Code Administration Grant Act of 2007 - Requires the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development to award grants, on a competitive basis and with federal matching funds, to qualified local building code enforcement departments to increase staffing, provide staff training, increase staff competence and professional qualifications, support individual certification or departmental accreditation, or for capital expenditures specifically dedicated to department administration.

Sets forth criteria for rating and ranking of grant proposals.