Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/10/2008
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/29/2008
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/14/2008
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 06/27/2008