Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 01/23/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 01/23/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 01/25/2008
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/15/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/15/2008
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/15/2008
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/15/2008
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/15/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/15/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/15/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/15/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/15/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/15/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/15/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/15/2008
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/15/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/15/2008
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/15/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/15/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/15/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/15/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/15/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/15/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/15/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/15/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/15/2008
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/15/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/15/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/15/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/15/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/15/2008
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/15/2008
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 04/15/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/15/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/15/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/15/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/16/2008
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/29/2008
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/29/2008
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/29/2008
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 04/29/2008
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/29/2008
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 04/29/2008
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/29/2008
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/29/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 04/29/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 04/29/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/29/2008
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 04/29/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 04/29/2008
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 04/29/2008
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 04/29/2008
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 04/29/2008
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 04/29/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/29/2008
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/29/2008
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/29/2008
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/29/2008
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 04/29/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/29/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/29/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 04/29/2008
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/29/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/29/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 04/29/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/29/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/29/2008
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/29/2008
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 04/29/2008
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/29/2008
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 04/29/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 06/04/2008