There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 36, United States Code, to grant a Federal charter to the Military Officers Association of America, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/24/2008Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. With written report No. 110-399.
12/18/2007Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
06/24/2008Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 834.
Action By: Senate
06/24/2008Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. With written report No. 110-399.
05/08/2008Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
12/18/2007Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/07/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/07/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/07/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/12/2008
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 05/12/2008
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/12/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/12/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/12/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/15/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/19/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/19/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/19/2008
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 05/19/2008
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/21/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 05/21/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/22/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/02/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/06/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/10/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/18/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/19/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/24/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 06/26/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/09/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 07/16/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/11/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary12/18/2007 Referred to
05/08/2008 Markup by
06/24/2008 Reported by S. Rept. 110-399

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2504. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (06/24/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Grants a federal charter to the Military Officers Association of America (a nonprofit corporation and incorporated under the laws of the Commonwealth of Virginia).