Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/07/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/07/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/07/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/12/2008
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 05/12/2008
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/12/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/12/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/12/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/15/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/19/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/19/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/19/2008
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 05/19/2008
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/21/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 05/21/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/22/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/02/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/06/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/10/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/18/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/19/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/24/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 06/26/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/09/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 07/16/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/11/2008