There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Cytology Proficiency Improvement Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Public Health Service Act to provide revised standards for quality assurance in screening and evaluation of gynecologic cytology preparations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/18/2007Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
12/18/2007Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S15920-15921)
Action By: Senate
12/18/2007Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S15920)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/19/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 02/12/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/25/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 02/28/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/02/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/02/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/07/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/09/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/14/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/15/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/16/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/21/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/24/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 05/06/2008
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/06/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/07/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/16/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/19/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/23/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/26/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/07/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/08/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/08/2008
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/09/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/23/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/23/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/28/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/29/2008
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/31/2008
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 07/31/2008
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 08/01/2008
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 08/01/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 09/08/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/08/2008
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/11/2008
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/18/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 09/23/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/24/2008
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/24/2008
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 09/24/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 10/01/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 12/10/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions12/18/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2510. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (12/18/2007)

Cytology Proficiency Improvement Act of 2007 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Secretary of Health and Human Services to revise national quality assurance standards to assure consistent performance by laboratories of valid and reliable cytology services, to include requirements that each clinical laboratory: (1) ensure that all individuals involved in screening and interpreting cytological preparations participate annually in an approved continuing medical education program in gynecologic cytology that provides each participant with gynecologic cytological preparations designed to improve locator, recognition, and interpretive skills; (2) maintain a record of program results; (3) require the laboratory director to consider such results and other performance metrics in reviewing the performance of individuals involved in screening and interpreting cytological preparations; and (4) submit the continuing education program results for each individual and plans for corrective action or remedial training in a timely manner to the laboratory's accrediting organization for purposes of review and ongoing monitoring.

Requires the Secretary to terminate individual proficiency testing that was in effect before enactment of this Act.