Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 12/18/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/19/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 02/12/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/25/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 02/28/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/02/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/02/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/07/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/09/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/14/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/15/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/16/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/21/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/24/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 05/06/2008
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/06/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/07/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/16/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/19/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/23/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/26/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/07/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/08/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/08/2008
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/09/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/23/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/23/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/28/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/29/2008
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/31/2008
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 07/31/2008
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 08/01/2008
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 08/01/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 09/08/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/08/2008
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/11/2008
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/18/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 09/23/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/24/2008
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/24/2008
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 09/24/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 10/01/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 12/10/2008