Summary: S.2514 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

There is one summary for S.2514. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (12/18/2007)

Standing with Minimum Wage Earners Act of 2007 - Amends the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to increase the federal minimum wage to: (1) $8.00 an hour, beginning on January 1, 2010; (2) $8.75 an hour, beginning on October 1, 2010; and (3) $9.50 an hour, beginning on July 1, 2011.

Declares that, beginning on July 1, 2012, and adjusted annually each July 1 thereafter, the amount of the minimum wage for the preceding year shall be increased by a percentage equal to that by which the annual rate of pay for Members of Congress increased for such year.