Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 01/22/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/22/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 02/26/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/28/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 03/10/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/01/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/10/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 04/14/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/23/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/24/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/01/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/15/2008