There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to award posthumously a Congressional gold medal to Constantino Brumidi.

Actions Overview (7)

07/01/2008 Became Public Law No: 110-259. (TXT | PDF)
07/01/2008 Signed by President.
06/24/2008 Presented to President.
06/10/2008 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5157-5158)
05/21/2007 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6414-6415)
05/17/2007 Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Reported by Senator Dodd with an amendment. Without written report.
01/10/2007 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
07/01/2008 Became Public Law No: 110-259. (TXT | PDF)
07/01/2008 Signed by President.
06/24/2008 Senate Presented to President.
06/10/2008-3:49pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/10/2008-3:49pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5157-5158)
06/10/2008-3:26pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 254.
06/10/2008-3:26pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5157-5160)
06/10/2008-3:25pm House Mr. Ackerman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/22/2007 House Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
05/22/2007 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
05/22/2007-10:03am House Received in the House.
05/21/2007 Senate Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6414-6415)
05/17/2007 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 150.
05/17/2007 Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Reported by Senator Dodd with an amendment. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs
05/16/2007 Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs
01/10/2007 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Cosponsors (99)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 01/30/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 01/30/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 01/30/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 02/01/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 02/01/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 02/01/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/06/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/06/2007
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 02/14/2007
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 02/14/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/15/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/15/2007
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 02/26/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/26/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 02/26/2007
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/15/2007
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/15/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/15/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/15/2007
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/15/2007
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/15/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/21/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/21/2007
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/21/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/21/2007
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/21/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/21/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/21/2007
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/21/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/21/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 03/21/2007
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/21/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/21/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/21/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/21/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/21/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/21/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 03/21/2007
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/21/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/21/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 03/21/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/21/2007
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/21/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/21/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/21/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/21/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/21/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/21/2007
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 03/21/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 03/21/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 03/21/2007
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/21/2007
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/21/2007
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/21/2007
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 03/21/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/21/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/21/2007
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/21/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 03/21/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/21/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/21/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/21/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/21/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/21/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/21/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/21/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/21/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/23/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/23/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/23/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/23/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/23/2007
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/23/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/23/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/23/2007
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/23/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/23/2007
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/23/2007
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/23/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/23/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/23/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/23/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/23/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/23/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 03/23/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/23/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/23/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/23/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 03/26/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/28/2007
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 03/28/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/10/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/17/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/17/2007
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 04/19/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/19/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/17/2007
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/17/2007

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs01/10/2007 Referred to
05/16/2007 Markup by
05/17/2007 Reported by
House Financial Services05/22/2007 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.254.

Subjects (7)

  • Artists
  • Capitol (Washington, D.C.)
  • Commemorations
  • Congressional gold medals
  • Sculpture

Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.254. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-259 (07/01/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on May 21, 2008. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Directs the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to make appropriate arrangements for the posthumous presentation, on behalf of Congress, of a gold medal to Constantino Brumidi, in recognition of his contributions to the nation as a designer and decorator of the U.S. Capitol.

Requires the Architect of the Capitol to arrange for the gold medal to be displayed in the Capitol Visitor Center as part of an exhibit honoring Constantino Brumidi.

Directs the Secretary of the Treasury, for purposes of the presentation, to strike a gold medal with suitable emblems, devices, and inscriptions.

Authorizes the Secretary to strike and sell duplicates in bronze of such gold medal.

States that: (1) the medals struck under this Act are national medals; and (2) all medals struck under this Act shall be considered to be numismatic items.

Authorizes to be charged against the U.S. Mint Public Enterprise Fund such amounts as may be necessary to pay for the costs of the medals struck pursuant to this Act.

Provides for amounts received from the sale of the duplicate bronze medals to be deposited into such Fund.