Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 01/10/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 01/30/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 01/30/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 01/30/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 02/01/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 02/01/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 02/01/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/06/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/06/2007
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 02/14/2007
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 02/14/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/15/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/15/2007
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 02/26/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/26/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 02/26/2007
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/15/2007
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/15/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/15/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/15/2007
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/15/2007
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/15/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/21/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/21/2007
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/21/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/21/2007
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/21/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/21/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/21/2007
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/21/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/21/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 03/21/2007
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/21/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/21/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/21/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/21/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/21/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/21/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 03/21/2007
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/21/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/21/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 03/21/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/21/2007
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/21/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/21/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/21/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/21/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/21/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/21/2007
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 03/21/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 03/21/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 03/21/2007
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/21/2007
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/21/2007
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/21/2007
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 03/21/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/21/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/21/2007
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/21/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 03/21/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/21/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/21/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/21/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/21/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/21/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/21/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/21/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/21/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/23/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/23/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/23/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/23/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/23/2007
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/23/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/23/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/23/2007
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/23/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/23/2007
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/23/2007
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/23/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/23/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/23/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/23/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/23/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/23/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 03/23/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/23/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/23/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/23/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/26/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/28/2007
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 03/28/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/10/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/17/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/17/2007
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 04/19/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/19/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/17/2007
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/17/2007