Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 01/22/2008
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/22/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/22/2008
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 01/22/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 01/22/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 01/22/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 01/22/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 01/23/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 01/23/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 01/24/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 01/24/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 01/24/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 01/24/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 01/24/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 01/25/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 01/25/2008
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 01/28/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/26/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/04/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/08/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/11/2008