Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 01/23/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/23/2008
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 01/30/2008
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 01/31/2008
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 01/31/2008
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 02/04/2008
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 02/04/2008
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 02/04/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 02/04/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/05/2008
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 02/05/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/11/2008
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 02/11/2008
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 02/12/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 02/12/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 02/12/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 02/14/2008
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/11/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/14/2008
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/17/2008