Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/24/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 01/24/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/24/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 01/24/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 01/24/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 01/24/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 01/24/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/24/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/24/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 01/24/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 01/24/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 01/24/2008
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 01/24/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/24/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/24/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/24/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/24/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 01/25/2008
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 01/28/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 01/28/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 01/29/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/25/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/01/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/16/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/16/2008
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/06/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew