Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/25/2008
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 01/31/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/05/2008
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/03/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/09/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/08/2008
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/19/2008