Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 01/29/2008
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 01/29/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/04/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/04/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/03/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 03/06/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/06/2008
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/08/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/21/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/25/2008