Summary: S.2566 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

There is one summary for S.2566. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/29/2008)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow purchasers of a single-family principal residence a one-time tax credit for up to $15,000 of the purchase price. Requires such a residence to be purchased after February 29, 2008, and before March 1, 2009, and that it be: (1) a new previously unoccupied residence for which a building permit has been issued and construction began on or before September 1, 2007; (2) an owner-occupied residence with a mortgage indebtedness in default on or before March 1, 2008; or (3) in foreclosure and owned by the mortgagor or the mortgagor's agent.