Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 01/29/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 01/29/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/29/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 01/29/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/29/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/29/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 01/29/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 01/30/2008
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 01/31/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/12/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 02/25/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 02/25/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/17/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/17/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/29/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/10/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/16/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/23/2008