There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to make technical corrections to the Federal Insecticide, Fungicide, and Rodenticide Act.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
03/06/2008Became Public Law No: 110-193. (TXT | PDF)
03/06/2008Signed by President.
02/28/2008Presented to President.
02/14/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 400 - 0 (Roll no. 63).(text: CR 2/13/2008 H900)
01/29/2008Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S454; text as passed Senate: CR S454)
01/29/2008Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/06/2008Became Public Law No: 110-193. (TXT | PDF)
03/06/2008Signed by President.
02/28/2008SenatePresented to President.
02/14/2008-2:59pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/14/2008-2:59pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 400 - 0 (Roll no. 63). (text: CR 2/13/2008 H900)
02/14/2008-2:52pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H965-966)
02/13/2008-3:00pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
02/13/2008-2:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2571.
02/13/2008-2:55pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H900-901)
02/13/2008-2:54pmHouseMr. Cardoza moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/06/2008-8:23pmHouseHeld at the desk.
02/06/2008-2:10pmHouseReceived in the House.
01/30/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/29/2008SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S454; text as passed Senate: CR S454)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 01/29/2008

Committees (0)

As of 09/18/2020 text has not been received for S.2571 - A bill to make technical corrections to the Federal Insecticide, Fungicide, and Rodenticide Act.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


No related bill information was received for S.2571.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2571. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-193 (03/06/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Federal Insecticide, Fungicide, and Rodenticide Act to authorize the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to exempt from, or waive a portion of, the registration service fee (currently, the Administrator may waive or reduce the fee) for an application for minor uses for a pesticide.

Authorizes the Administrator to exempt an application from the registration service fee (currently, the Administrator may waive the fee) if the application is solely associated with a tolerance petition submitted in connection with the Inter-Regional Project Number 4 and the exemption is in the public service.

Subjects applications received before September 30, 2012 (currently, applications received before September 30, 2008) to specified decision time review periods.