Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 01/30/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/30/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/30/2008
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 01/30/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/30/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/30/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 01/30/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/30/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/30/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/30/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/05/2008
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 02/29/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/12/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/21/2008