Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/30/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/25/2008
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/25/2008
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 02/28/2008
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/11/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/11/2008
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/13/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 04/02/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 04/02/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/07/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/07/2008
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 04/07/2008
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/07/2008
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/07/2008
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 04/14/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/21/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 04/21/2008
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/06/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 05/06/2008
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/06/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 05/06/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/13/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/13/2008
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/13/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/13/2008
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/13/2008
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/13/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/13/2008
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/13/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/13/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/20/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/20/2008
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/20/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/20/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 05/20/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/03/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/03/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/10/2008
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/10/2008
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/10/2008
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/18/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/23/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/23/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/23/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/23/2008
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/23/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 06/25/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/25/2008
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/09/2008
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/09/2008
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/09/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 07/09/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/09/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/09/2008
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/09/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/14/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/14/2008
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/14/2008
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/14/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/15/2008
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 07/15/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/15/2008
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/15/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/15/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/15/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/15/2008
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/16/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/16/2008
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/22/2008
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/22/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/22/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 07/22/2008
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 07/29/2008
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/29/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/29/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 08/01/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/09/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/09/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/09/2008
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 09/09/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/16/2008
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/16/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/16/2008