Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 01/30/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/13/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 02/14/2008
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/27/2008
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 02/27/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 02/29/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/04/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/06/2008
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/13/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/01/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/01/2008