Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 02/06/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/14/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 02/25/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 04/10/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 04/10/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/10/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/10/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/10/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/10/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/06/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/06/2008
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/20/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/17/2008