Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 02/06/2008
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/06/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 02/06/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 02/06/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 02/06/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 02/08/2008
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/08/2008
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 02/08/2008
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/12/2008
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 02/12/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/14/2008
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 02/25/2008