Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/06/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/06/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/06/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/06/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 02/06/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/06/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/05/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/06/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/12/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/12/2008
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/12/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/31/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 04/15/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/29/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/01/2008