Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/07/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 02/07/2008
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/07/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 03/04/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/05/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/06/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 03/07/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/11/2008
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 03/11/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/12/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/07/2008
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/04/2008