Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 04/07/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/08/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 04/10/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 04/10/2008
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 04/10/2008
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/21/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/24/2008
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/28/2008
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/28/2008
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 04/28/2008
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 05/06/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/07/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/07/2008
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/12/2008
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/13/2008
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/21/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 06/04/2008
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/12/2008
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/16/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/16/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/17/2008
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/17/2008
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 09/08/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/17/2008