Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/14/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 02/28/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/04/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/05/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/11/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/01/2008
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/07/2008
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/29/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/16/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 11/17/2008