Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/25/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 02/25/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 02/25/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/26/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/26/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 02/28/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/03/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 03/04/2008