Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 02/25/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/25/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 02/25/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 02/25/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 03/03/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/03/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/10/2008
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 04/22/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/24/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/06/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/07/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/13/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/13/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/14/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/15/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/21/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/09/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/12/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/12/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/18/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/24/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/07/2008