Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/16/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/22/2008
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/22/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/03/2008
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/17/2008
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 07/10/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/16/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 08/01/2008