Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 02/26/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/04/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/11/2008
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/11/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/09/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 04/15/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/21/2008
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/22/2008
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/14/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/15/2008
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/21/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/21/2008
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 05/21/2008
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/21/2008
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/22/2008
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/22/2008
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/22/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/04/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 06/10/2008
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/11/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/11/2008
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/17/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/17/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/17/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/18/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/25/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/26/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/07/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/07/2008
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/07/2008
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 07/09/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/09/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/11/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/14/2008
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/16/2008
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/24/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/25/2008
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/28/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/28/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/31/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/31/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/08/2008
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 09/15/2008
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/16/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/17/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/18/2008
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/23/2008
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/23/2008
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/24/2008
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/25/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/25/2008
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/25/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/25/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/26/2008
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 09/26/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/26/2008
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 09/26/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/29/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/29/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 09/29/2008