Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 01/11/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/11/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 01/11/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/11/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/11/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 01/11/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/11/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/11/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/17/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 01/18/2007
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 01/24/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 01/24/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/15/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/15/2008