Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 02/27/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/01/2008
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 04/01/2008
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/01/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/14/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/22/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/22/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/01/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/25/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/25/2008