Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 02/29/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 02/29/2008
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/29/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 02/29/2008
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 02/29/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/31/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/10/2008
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/10/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 04/10/2008
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/10/2008
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 04/10/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/10/2008
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/10/2008
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 04/10/2008
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/15/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/15/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/15/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/15/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/15/2008
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 04/15/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 04/22/2008
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/22/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/22/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/22/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/22/2008
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 04/28/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/28/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 04/28/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 04/28/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/28/2008
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 04/28/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/07/2008
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/07/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/07/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/07/2008
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/07/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/07/2008
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 05/07/2008
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/22/2008
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/22/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/22/2008
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/22/2008
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/05/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/05/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/23/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/23/2008
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/23/2008
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/24/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/24/2008
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/07/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/07/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/07/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/10/2008
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/10/2008
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/22/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 07/22/2008
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/24/2008
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/24/2008
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/25/2008
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/25/2008
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 07/25/2008
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/25/2008
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 07/25/2008
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/25/2008
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 07/25/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/25/2008
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/25/2008
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/25/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/25/2008
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/25/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/30/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 09/09/2008
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/09/2008