Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 03/04/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 03/04/2008
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/14/2008
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/14/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 04/16/2008
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/17/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/24/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 04/24/2008
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/29/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/07/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/29/2008