Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 03/05/2008
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/12/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/12/2008
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 03/12/2008
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/12/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 03/12/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/12/2008
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/12/2008
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/12/2008
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/02/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/04/2008
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 04/10/2008