Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 04/01/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/01/2008
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 04/01/2008
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/03/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/04/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/07/2008
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 05/07/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/13/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/30/2008