Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/07/2008
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/07/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 03/07/2008
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/11/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/12/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/13/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/03/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/20/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 06/18/2008
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/18/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/24/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/26/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 07/10/2008