Refine your search

Showing 6 of 6 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
05/08/2008 Became Public Law No: 110-229.
05/08/2008 Signed by President.
05/01/2008 Presented to President.
04/29/2008 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 291 - 117 (Roll no. 226).(text: CR H2773-2806)
04/10/2008 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 91 - 4. Record Vote Number: 101.(text: CR S2883-2917)
03/10/2008 Introduced in Senate