Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/13/2008
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 03/13/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/10/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 04/15/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 04/15/2008
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 04/22/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 05/07/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/07/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 05/08/2008
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 11/20/2008